Accounts and annual returns SALISBURY DEAF SOCIAL CLUB

Charity number: 1051170
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 04 December 2024 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2022 04 December 2024 431 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2021 11 November 2022 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2020 11 November 2022 407 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 26 March 2021 177 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required