Financial history HELPRINGHAM SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1051293
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022
Total gross income £5.60k £3.63k £0 £0 £197
Total expenditure £295 £11.18k £110 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A