Trustees VICTORIA DOCK VILLAGE HALL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1051351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHRISTOPHER HALL Chair 10 July 2006
None on record
Vicki Knowles Trustee 03 September 2024
None on record
Barbara Leech Trustee 07 June 2023
None on record
Steven Wilson Trustee 16 May 2022
None on record
Emily Woodcock Trustee 16 November 2021
None on record
Sarah Louise McGurn Trustee 04 January 2021
None on record
Martin Botterill Trustee 13 February 2020
None on record
Maria Kelwick Trustee 19 September 2019
None on record
Melanie Mills Trustee 01 March 2017
None on record