Accounts and annual returns THE BRUNNER MOND EMPLOYEE'S CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1051363
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2008 27 July 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2007 09 February 2009 162 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2007 Not Required