Accounts and annual returns SPORLE PAVILION, PLAYING FIELD AND CHILDREN'S PLAYPARK

Charity number: 1051466
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 05 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 02 June 2024 123 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 June 2021 150 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 June 2021 150 days late