Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF HATCH BEAUCHAMP SCHOOL

Charity number: 1051502
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 September 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 01 September 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 01 September 2021 14 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2020 14 February 2022 228 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2019 14 February 2022 593 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2019 Not Required