Trustees MADINA MOSQUE AND MUSLAMIC COMMUNITY CENTRE
Charity Number: 1051556

Charity reporting is up to date (116 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Irfan Akream | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
shahbaz ahmed khan khan | Trustee | 21 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiaz Khan | Trustee | 28 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Munir Ahmed | Trustee | 28 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad asif | Trustee | 03 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Khalil Ahmed choudhry | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
NASIR AHMED | Trustee | 21 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
majid dad | Trustee | 16 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
mohammad afzal | Trustee | 16 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANJUM HANIF | Trustee | 11 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
MR MIAH KHAN | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED SALEEM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MUHAMMAD HANIF | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.