Financial history RAWCLIFFE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1051652
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £18.52k £3.26k £6.87k £6.66k £13.50k
Total expenditure £10.90k £6.91k £11.54k £8.38k £19.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.20k N/A N/A N/A £1.61k