Accounts and annual returns BRIDLINGTON PENTECOSTAL CHURCH

Charity Number: 1051943
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2009 16 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2008 12 August 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2008 Not Required