Accounts and annual returns LEICESTER FESTIVAL OF MUSIC AND DRAMA

Charity Number: 1052098
Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required