Accounts and annual returns WROXHAM AND DISTICT ROUND TABLE 1012

Charity number: 1052107
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 16 September 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 24 August 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 01 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 29 September 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required