Trustees CITY LIFE CHURCH - SUNDERLAND
Charity Number: 1052114

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edward Douglas Morrow | Trustee | 14 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kerina Lucy Clark | Trustee | 14 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin James Dowding | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon Hilton | Trustee | 26 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lewis Collins | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN DAVID CLARKE | Trustee | 05 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN CLARKE | Trustee | 10 April 1993 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.