Financial history THE STOREHOUSE

Charity number: 1052143
Charity reporting is up to date (142 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £123.94k £151.68k £185.98k £198.11k £227.20k
Total expenditure £107.61k £120.37k £180.75k £212.04k £188.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £33.95k £33.33k £3.00k £3.00k