Trustees WALTON BLIND SOCIETY
Charity Number: 1052479
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROL COLLINGS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Pam Gough | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
CAROL LEWIN | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Moon | Trustee | 26 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carol Reed | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Horwood | Trustee | 10 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
JEAN VAN HEGAN | Trustee | 21 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
DONALD MARCHANT | Trustee | 21 July 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.