Financial history KINGS FAMILY CHURCH

Charity Number: 1052599
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £68.83k £47.35k £48.40k £47.04k £66.97k
Total expenditure £66.33k £49.54k £46.29k £48.57k £52.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A