Accounts and annual returns BIRCHFIELD INDEPENDENT GIRLS SCHOOL

Charity number: 1053283
Charity reporting is up to date (54 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 24 July 2024 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 24 July 2024 54 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 26 November 2023 179 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 26 November 2023 179 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 17 January 2023 231 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 17 January 2023 231 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 28 March 2022 301 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 28 March 2022 301 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 12 October 2020 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 12 October 2020 134 days late Download Open in new window