Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF BARNWOOD SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1053415
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 28 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 14 February 2024 199 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 21 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 26 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 24 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required