Financial history LORDSHIP FARM JUNIOR MIXED INFANT SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1053471
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £19.03k £11.44k £10.55k £13.06k £11.23k
Total expenditure £17.64k £22.73k £6.28k £19.23k £4.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A