Accounts and annual returns Bromham CofE Primary School PTA

Charity number: 1053493
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 03 September 2024 01 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 03 September 2023 01 April 2025 272 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 03 September 2022 20 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 03 September 2021 01 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 03 September 2020 01 March 2022 241 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 September 2020 Not Required