Financial history BARRY ROUND TABLE CHARITY ACCOUNT

Charity Number: 1053498
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.92k £5.29k £6.18k £14.59k £22.92k
Total expenditure £9.19k £5.89k £8.70k £13.70k £24.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £600 £2.30k