Accounts and annual returns WARE CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1053600
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 July 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 15 July 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 15 July 2016 03 May 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 July 2016 05 May 2017 On Time
Annual return 15 July 2015 04 December 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 July 2015 07 December 2015 On Time
Annual return 15 July 2014 06 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 July 2014 12 January 2015 On Time