Accounts and annual returns TUDNO PLAYSCHOOL

Charity number: 1053656
Charity reporting is up to date (70 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 03 April 2024 14 April 2025 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 April 2024 14 April 2025 70 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 03 April 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 April 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 03 April 2022 25 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 April 2022 25 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 03 April 2021 02 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 April 2021 02 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 03 April 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 April 2020 28 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window