Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF SOUTH HAMPSTEAD HIGH SCHOOL (F.O.S.H)

Charity number: 1053853
Charity reporting is overdue by 317 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 317 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 317 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 02 October 2023 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 19 July 2021 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 02 July 2021 367 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required