Accounts and annual returns THE ANGLIAN WATER TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1054026
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 14 September 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 14 September 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 07 August 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 12 November 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 15 October 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 31 October 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 16 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 21 November 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 15 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 15 November 2005 On Time