Governing document THRESHOLD HOUSING PROJECT LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/02/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/11/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/04/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09/05/2011 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 28/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 MAY 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.