Financial history BRYNTIRION COMPREHENSIVE SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1054036
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2010 31/08/2011 31/08/2012 31/08/2013 31/08/2014
Total gross income £4.93k £3.12k £1.95k £2.19k £2.78k
Total expenditure £1.60k £7.63k £576 £2.64k £3.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A