Accounts and annual returns ROTARY CLUB OF MANCHESTER EXCHANGE

Charity number: 1054122
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2005 26 June 2006 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2005 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2004 04 November 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2004 Not Required