Accounts and annual returns RELENTLESS CHURCH ST IVES

Charity number: 1054328
Charity reporting is up to date (120 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 February 2025 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 February 2025 120 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 September 2024 309 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 February 2022 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 February 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required