Accounts and annual returns PROJECT AGAPE (ROCHDALE CHURCH)

Charity number: 1054444
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 13 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required