Trustees HINCKLEY AND BOSWORTH AREA COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SCHEME
Charity number: 1054668

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEVEN APPLIN | Chair | 20 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
William Kelly | Trustee | 18 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Pratt | Trustee | 18 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barry Orton | Trustee | 10 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julie Smith | Trustee | 11 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Brian Perkins | Trustee | 10 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Braden | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COLIN PHILIP HIGGINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER HOUGHTON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.