Financial history ART-INTER ROMANIA

Charity number: 1054676
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013
Total gross income £10.59k £1.34k £924 £429 £346
Total expenditure £15.01k £1.28k £1.11k £3.08k £613
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A