Accounts and annual returns BARKING, HAVERING AND BRENTWOOD MENTAL HEALTH USERS GROUP (HUBB)

Charity number: 1054860
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2012 29 August 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 29 August 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2011 19 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 19 October 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 30 November 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 25 November 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 25 September 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 25 September 2009 On Time