Accounts and annual returns BRAMPTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1054920
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2012 30 July 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2012 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2011 28 June 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2011 28 June 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 07 December 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 07 December 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 16 December 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 16 December 2009 On Time