Financial history EAST HUNTSPILL PRE SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE

Charity number: 1055106
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £58.30k £48.29k £71.09k £56.28k £53.49k
Total expenditure £60.91k £45.75k £67.67k £53.03k £59.57k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £43.67k N/A N/A N/A N/A