Accounts and annual returns SPECTRUM U.M.D.S

Charity number: 1055162
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 27 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 27 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 27 December 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 27 December 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 27 December 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 27 December 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 27 December 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 27 December 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 26 December 2004 31 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 26 December 2004 Not Required