Trustees ADVOCACY MATTERS (WALES)
Charity number: 1055211

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clayton Williams | Trustee | 05 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rhodri Davies | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Clarke | Trustee | 29 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Owen Thomas QC | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Paul Sutton | Trustee | 09 February 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.