Accounts and annual returns NORTH EAST LINCS ANIMAL RESCUE

Charity Number: 1055233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 08 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 07 June 2024 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 11 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 20 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 03 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required