Financial history THE FRIENDS OF BANHAM ZOO

Charity number: 1055264
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012
Total gross income £73.77k £89.91k £94.57k £91.29k £105.04k
Total expenditure £79.47k £72.03k £82.28k £93.64k £146.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A