Financial history THE BPR TRUST

Charity Number: 1055447
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £234.70k £157.00k £124.93k £153.82k £258.54k
Total expenditure £427.45k £403.00k £311.03k £311.43k £344.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A