Accounts and annual returns ULEY UNDER 5'S PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1055461
Charity reporting is overdue by 725 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 359 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 359 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 725 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 725 days
Annual return 31 July 2021 24 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 24 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 22 November 2021 175 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 22 November 2021 175 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 14 July 2020 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 14 July 2020 44 days late Download Open in new window