Financial history SEYMOUR HOUSE (PLYMOUTH)

Charity number: 1055836
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £564 £564 £2.05k £1.24k £144
Total expenditure £540 £942 £752 £691 £714
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A