Financial history SWANSEA MULTICULTURAL WOMEN'S RESOURCE AND TRAINING CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1055934
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £156 £104 £60 £60 £60
Total expenditure £60 £84 £84 £84 £84
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A