Trustees CALDAY GRANGE SWIMMING POOL TRUST
Charity number: 1056069

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heather Lovell | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Hastain | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Gray | Trustee | 20 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robbie Ross | Trustee | 18 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CHAPMAN | Trustee | 24 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
CATHY JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SANDRA HIND | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.