Accounts and annual returns THE CAN-CAN COMPANY

Charity number: 1056220
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2004 24 November 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2004 Not Required