Financial history CYLCH MEITHRIN RHYDYPENNAU

Charity Number: 1056292
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £18.06k £28.36k £43.07k £74.23k £92.97k
Total expenditure £21.32k £21.61k £38.57k £53.07k £66.64k
Income from government contracts N/A £8.10k N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants £3.13k £8.10k £400 £2.93k £0