Financial history CYLCH MEITHRIN BEDDAU

Charity number: 1056295
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £16.90k £27.33k £31.43k £54.33k £57.32k
Total expenditure £14.74k £26.83k £27.37k £42.18k £45.38k
Income from government contracts £150 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £150 £0 £5.00k £36.38k £37.24k