Accounts and annual returns CYLCH MEITHRIN LLANNON

Charity Number: 1056337
Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 March 2025 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 March 2024 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 March 2023 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 April 2022 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required