Financial history SIMPLY CHRISTIANS-LONGFORD

Charity Number: 1056418
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £3.87k £984 £0 £1.39k £0
Total expenditure £3.23k £970 £783 £660 £974
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A