Financial history LA SOCIETE FRANCO BRITANNIQUE DE CARDIFF

Charity number: 1056433
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £3.50k £393 £585 £3.43k £3.43k
Total expenditure £4.00k £817 £1.62k £3.32k £3.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A