Accounts and annual returns BROXBOURNE CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 1056547
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 30 November 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 05 December 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 12 February 2007 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 12 February 2007 12 days late
Annual return 31 March 2005 18 April 2006 77 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 01 March 2006 29 days late
Annual return 31 March 2004 04 October 2005 246 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 04 November 2004 On Time